Rachlis, Anita Rochelle (CPSO#: 25835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
H266 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6044
Fax: (416) 480-4268
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Val Rachlis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rachlis ( CPSO# 25835 )
Dr. V. Rachlis ( CPSO# 25834 )

Business Address:
Suite 260
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 497-6363

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA ROCHELLE RACHLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACHLIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1973