Racine, Francois (CPSO#: 42142)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Francois Racine Medical Archives 160 de Serignan Street Gatineau QC J8V 3V1
Date Received: 28 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015