Racine, Jennifer (CPSO#: 91370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital , Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Racine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Racine ( CPSO# 91370 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Suite B302
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER RACINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014