Racine, Martin Lucien (CPSO#: 70141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 9
16299 Fairview Drive
Avonmore ON  K0C 1C0
Phone: (613) 346-2710
Fax: (613) 346-0638
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Racine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Racine ( CPSO# 70141 )

Business Address:
16299 Fairview Drive
Avonmore ON  K0C 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 346-2710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN LUCIEN RACINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998