Raco, Dominic Lorenzo (CPSO#: 51457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Room N 2 918
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6221
Fax: (905) 494-6717
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dominic L. Raco Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Raco ( CPSO# 51457 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Room N 2 918
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6221

Business Address:
Hamiton Health Sciences - General Site
237 Barton Stree East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre - Etobicoke General
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 494-6221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMINIC LORENZO RACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1984