Raddatz, Elaine (CPSO#: 84614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
8 York Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone: (416) 366-2273
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raddatz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Raddatz ( CPSO# 84614 )

Business Address:
Unit 4
8 York Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone Number: (416) 366-2273

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE RADDATZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADDATZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)