Raddatz, Eric Henry (CPSO#: 88626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markland Wood Medical Clinic
4335 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2A5
Phone: (416) 695-8878
Fax: (416) 695-2622
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Raddatz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Raddatz ( CPSO# 88626 )

Business Address:
Markland Wood Medical Clinic
4335 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2A5
Phone Number: (416) 695-8878

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC HENRY RADDATZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADDATZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010