Radhakrishnan, Ravikumar (CPSO#: 85593)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Madras, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007