Radhakrishnan, Shyam (CPSO#: 66592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A208
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4668
Fax: (416) 480-5404
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shyam Radhakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Radhakrishnan ( CPSO# 66592 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite A208
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4668

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 15 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHYAM RADHAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADHAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1998