Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Radhi, Jasim Mohammed (CPSO#: 66374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Labratory Service
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905) 721-4757
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Radhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Radhi ( CPSO# 66374 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Laboratory Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASIM MOHAMMED RADHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1993