Radina, Maria (CPSO#: 88627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Country Glen Medical Center
592 Country Glen Rd
Markham ON  L6B 1E8
Phone: 905-554-4001
Fax: 905-554-4002
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7373
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Centre for Respiratory Health
377 Churst St. Rm G-7
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7614
Fax: 905-472-7618
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arash Gharajeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gharajeh ( CPSO# 88605 )
Dr. M. Radina ( CPSO# 88627 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
9401 Jane Street
Maple ON  L6A 4H7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA RADINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADINA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014