Radomski, Sidney Ben (CPSO#: 54228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
MP8 - Room 304
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5713
Fax: (416) 603-5391
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sidney Radomski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Radomski ( CPSO# 54228 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite MP8 - 304
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5713

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDNEY BEN RADOMSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADOMSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1987