Radovanovic, Ingrid Natalie (CPSO#: 93753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
715 Coronation Blvd- Suite 3
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone: 5196228715
Fax: 5196227329
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ingrid Radovanovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Radovanovic ( CPSO# 93753 )

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9

Business Address:
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1G8

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients should forward requests for medical records to the following email address: ortho.scheduling@hotmail.com.
Date Received: 05 Oct 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INGRID NATALIE RADOVANOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADOVANOVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015