Radwan, John Stephen (CPSO#: 54699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Regional Cancer Clinic
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5000
Fax: (905) 813-3962
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Radwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Radwan ( CPSO# 54699 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
PRCC Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN STEPHEN RADWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1985