Radzinski, Charles Aaron (CPSO#: 55713)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 404
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 256-2737
Fax: (416) 256-9098
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Radzinski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Radzinski ( CPSO# 55713 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 256-2737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 20 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES AARON RADZINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADZINSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1987