Radziuk, Jerzy Mikolaj (CPSO#: 32160)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 316 Daly Avenue Ottawa ON K1N 6G7
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017