Rae, Christopher James (CPSO#: 74960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lanark County Mental Health
Unit 14
5 Bates Drive
Carleton Place ON  K7C 4J8
Phone: (613) 283-2170
Fax: (613) 257-8101
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ADMH
350 John St N
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
Phone: 613-623-3166 Ext. 266
Fax: 613-623-3354
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

CMHS
128 Mary St -- Unit C
Arnprior ON  K7S 1E6
Canada
Phone: 18009927711 Ext. 5705
Fax: (613) 623-4121
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

CMHS
Suite 1
180 Plaunt St
Renfrew ON  K7V1M8
Canada
Phone: 18009917711
Fax: 6134323806
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CJ Rae Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rae ( CPSO# 74960 )

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
5 Bates Drive
Suite 14
Carleton Place ON  K7C 4J9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2170

Business Address:
1 - 180 Plaunt Street
Renfrew ON  K7V 1M8

Business Address:
128C Mary Street
Arnprior ON  K7S 1E6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES RAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 08 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 09 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006