Rae-Grant, Quentin Alexander Frain (CPSO#: 29741)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2014