Rafail, Ehab Assaad (CPSO#: 26402)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rafail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 4 2004


Corporation Name: Rafail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Feb 2015