Rafaj, Jaroslav (CPSO#: 51460)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Jun 2000
Summary:

 On June 27, 2000, the Discipline Committee released its decision, finding Dr. Rafaj guilty of 
 sexual impropriety with a patient.

On October 31, 2000, the Discipline Committee ordered that the 
 Dr. Jaroslav Rafaj(s license to practice be revoked, and directed that the fact of the reprimand 
 be recorded on the Register.

On Novembe 29, 2000 Dr. Rafaj appealed the decision of the 
 Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court.  The order of the Discipline Committee does not take 
 effect until the outcome of the appeal.

On October 21, 2002, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. 
 Rafaj(s appeal.  Therefore, Dr. Rafaj(s certificate of registration is revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 21 Oct 2002
Hearing Date(s): Dec 13, 1999