Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rafferty, Eugene Francis (CPSO#: 32423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
559 Hemingway Place
Waterloo ON  N2T 1Z4
Phone: (519) 886-4278
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4262 Ext. 3819
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Freeport Health Centre
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eugene Rafferty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rafferty ( CPSO# 32423 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Medical Imaging Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENE FRANCIS RAFFERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAFFERTY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1981