Rafiqi, Wajahat Hussain (CPSO#: 87665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: Hussain, Wajahat (used until: 25 May 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kashmiri, Persian, Urdu

Education:Kashmir University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Spring Valley Family Practice
Unit 6
15- Ashby -FIELD ROAD
Brampton ON  L6X 3B7
Phone: (905) 230-4811
Fax: (905) 230-4814
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 621-2330
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAJAHAT HUSSAIN RAFIQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAFIQI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009