Ragan, Edward John (CPSO#: 19940)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jan 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jan 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 13, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Edward J. Ragan resigned from the College effective January 19, 2015 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.