Raghavan, Ramya (CPSO#: 74953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 751-2941
Fax: (905) 751-0107
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

80 Holland street East
PO Box #1361
Bradford ON  L3Z 2B7
Canada
Phone: 905 551 2944
Fax: 877 552 9250
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMYA RAGHAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHAVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2005