Ragheb, Bahaa Gamil (CPSO#: 68795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Place Centrum Medical Centre
Suite 207
210 Centrum Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1E 3V7
Phone: (613) 830-5658
Fax: (613) 830-2260
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAHAA GAMIL RAGHEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHEB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997