Raghuraman, Anusha (CPSO#: 66063)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raghuraman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Raghuraman ( CPSO# 66064 )
Dr. A. Raghuraman ( CPSO# 66063 )

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Suite 118
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 633-9420

Medical Records Location

Address: 19 Jardin Hill Court North York, ON M2H 3R8
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018