Ragonetti, Christopher Howard (CPSO#: 64191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Brant Centre
1182 Northshore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1C5
Canada
Phone: (905) 639-2848
Fax: (905) 639-8023
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Billings Court Manor
3700 Billings Court
Burlington ON  L7N 3N6
Canada
Phone: (905) 333-4006
Fax: (905) 333-4416
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Ragonetti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ragonetti ( CPSO# 64191 )

Business Address:
Suite 93156
1450 Headen Road
Halton Hills ON  L7M 4A3

Business Address:
4100 Upper Middle Road
Burlington ON  L7M 4W8

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1182 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1C5
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER HOWARD RAGONETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGONETTI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992