Rahal, John Michael Patrick (CPSO#: 32310)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Feb 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005