Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rahalkar, Mangal Ramesh (CPSO#: 60700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Pune, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Community Health Services
160 Exmouth Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 7Z6
Canada
Phone: (619) 383-8331
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Rahalkar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rahalkar ( CPSO# 60700 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
Community Health Services
160 Exmouth Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 7Z6
Phone Number: (519) 383-8331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANGAL RAMESH RAHALKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHALKAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1990