Rahim, Alya (CPSO#: 81068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Downtown Toronto Doctors
Suite 630
Box 70
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (647) 427-6001
Fax: (416) 598-4659
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Rahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rahim ( CPSO# 81068 )

Business Address:
Downtown Toronto Doctors
Suite 630
790 Bay Street
P O Box 70
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (647) 427-6001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALYA RAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006