Rahim, Yasmin Hussain (CPSO#: 51461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Dow Medical College, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6596
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasmin Rahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Rahim ( CPSO# 51461 )

Business Address:
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASMIN HUSSAIN RAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1987