Rahimpour, Roya (CPSO#: 59223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Farsi, French, German, Persian, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2537 - Regional Road 56
Binbrook ON  L0R 1C0
Phone: (905) 692-2580
Fax: (905) 692-0258
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roya Rahimpour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 4 2006


Corporation Name: Roya Rahimpour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rahimpour ( CPSO# 59223 )

Business Address:
2537 Hwy 56
Suite B6
Hamilton ON  L0R 1C0
Phone Number: (905) 692-2580

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact the clinic where they were seen by Dr. Roya Rahimpour.
Date Received: 05 May 2015

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROYA RAHIMPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHIMPOUR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)