Rahkovich, Michael (CPSO#: 107319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 05 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Lugansk State Medical University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4524
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL RAHKOVICH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. RAHKOVICH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. RAHKOVICH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAHKOVICH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RAHKOVICH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. RAHKOVICH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. RAHKOVICH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018