Rahman, Al-Amin Mahfuzur Proton (CPSO#: 67302)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 2000