Rahman, K M Anisur (CPSO#: 89188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Dhaka, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Woodlands Medical Centre
Suite 204
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone: (519) 759-6116
Fax: (519) 759-7727
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Willett Urgent care
238 grand river street North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Canada
Phone: (519) 442-2251
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Brantford General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 752-7871
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K M Anisur Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rahman ( CPSO# 89188 )

Business Address:
North Woodlands Medical Centre
204 - 40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: (519) 759-6116

Business Address:
238 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2M2
Phone Number: (519) 442-2251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. K M ANISUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012