Rahmani, Armita (CPSO#: 73490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Emergency Department
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Fax: (613) 548-1374
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Rahmani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rahmani ( CPSO# 73490 )

Business Address:
Kington General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Emergency Room
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2368

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARMITA RAHMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001