Rahmani, Kia Modareszadeh (CPSO#: 63713)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Oct 2000