Rahnema, Nazanine (CPSO#: 80961)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saberi & Rahnema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 2009