Rai, Bikramjit Singh (CPSO#: 98022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
368 College Street North
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone: (519) 369-2510
Fax: (519) 369-3831
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Rai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rai ( CPSO# 98022 )

Business Address:
368 College Street North
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 369-2510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIKRAMJIT SINGH RAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014