Rai, Sherapartap Singh (CPSO#: 87407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Jun 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Ross University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
375 Howden Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 4L6
Phone: (905) 2303137
Fax: (905) 790-1555
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should send a written request to: 131 Talbot Street West Leamington, ON N8H 1N2
Date Received: 14 Jul 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2007 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 07 May 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 07 May 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 06 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 07 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., May 7, 2016, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Sherapartap Singh Rai:

            Dr. Rai shall participate in and successfully complete the next available
            course on "Understanding Boundaries and Managing the Risks Inherent in the
            Doctor-Patient Relationship" offered by Western University, or an equivalent
            program acceptable to the College, and shall forthwith thereafter provide proof
            of completion thereof to the College.


            As from June September 30, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition
            and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sherapartap Singh
            Rai, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rai to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. SHERAPARTAP SINGH RAI
                                          ("Dr. Rai")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Rai, certificate of registration number 87407, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice through the report of an assessment of my practice.

            (2)    I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that, upon receiving this Undertaking signed by
                  me, the Collegehas agreed to take no further action in response to the
                        report of the assessment of my practice dated January 5, 2015.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts once every
                              month for six months, and thereafter review at least twenty
                              (20) of my patient charts once every three months for a
                              further six months, which shall be selected independently by
                              the Clinical Supervisor(s);
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me once every month for six months, and thereafter
                              meet with me every three months for a further six months;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with these recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month for the first six months, and at least every three
                              months for the following six months, or more frequently if
                              the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of
                              practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within sixty
                        (60) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Rai, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (4)(d) and/or
                        (e) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Rai, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (4)(f) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (5)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (4) above
                        and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rai, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "B."
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of
                  all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation
                  of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which
                  is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,
                  c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (12)  I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                  Dr. Rai underwent an assessment of his practice.  As a result of the
                  assessment:
                  
                  *     Dr. Rai will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  *     Dr. Rai's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by
                        the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Rai, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Rai, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Rai, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention and which he or she reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
                  
            As from December 10, 2012 and as amended on September 18, 2014, the following
            term, condition and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration
            held by Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai, in accordance with an undertaking and
            consent Dr. Rai has given to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Rai shall only work at Howden Medical Clinic located at 2-375 Howden
                  Boulevard, Brampton, Ontario and at 1975 Cottrelle Boulevard, Brampton,
                  Ontario for no more than 32 hours/week over 4-5 days.  Dr. Rai shall not
                  work evenings, weekends or on-call.  Dr. Rai shall not make house calls
                  or engage in patient encounters at the home of the patient, at his own
                  home, or in any non-clinical setting.  
                  
                  
            As from June 24, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sherapartap Singh
            Rai, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rai to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing
                  privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances and
                  preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from
                  time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance    Relinquished      Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)    X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) X

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jan 2016
Summary:

On January 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai committed an act of professional misconduct, in 
that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to 
all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable 
or unprofessional. 

During the relevant time period, Dr. Rai practised in an emergency room at the only hospital in a 
small town.  He was also engaged in a sexual relationship with the woman in issue, Ms. A, 
throughout that period.  It was undisputed that Dr. Rai assessed, diagnosed and treated Ms. A on 
one occasion in a clinic and on nine occasions at the hospital ER over a number of years.  The 
Discipline Committee determined that the medical treatments did not give rise to a physician-
patient relationship, however.  It noted that there was no evidence that Dr. Rai provided regular 
care to Ms. A and that there was no evidence the ER visits were arranged ahead of time, or that 
there was another physician available in the ER to see her when she visited.  All of the treatment 
occasions constituted “incidental care.”  In particular, the Committee held that “given the context 
of the small town ER, Dr. Rai had no choice but to attend to [her] medical needs and to provide 
care for her problems,” finding that the ER visits were “incidental care to a spouse, given the 
nature of the visits and the unique set of circumstances in this case.”  The clinic treatment was 
ill-advised, but it did not create a doctor-patient relationship. 

Dr. Rai was found to have engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with 
respect to treating Ms. A at a clinic visit at which he performed a Pap test and ordered blood 
work, by treating a family member in a non-emergency situation.   

PENALTY 

On May 6, 2016, the Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Rai’s certificate 
of registration for period of two (2) months, to commence at 12:01 a.m. on May 7, 2016.  

The Committee ordered Dr. Rai to appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 

The Committee directed the Registrar to place the following terms, conditions or limitations on 
Dr. Rai’s certificate of registration:  

      Dr. Rai shall participate in and successfully complete the next available course on 
      “Understanding Boundaries and Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient 
      Relationship” offered by Western University, or an equivalent program acceptable to the 
      College, and shall forthwith thereafter provide proof of completion thereof to the College. 

COSTS 

The Committee ordered Dr. Rai to pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of 
$4,460.00, within one hundred and twenty (120) days of the date upon which the suspension of 
his certificate of registration is lifted.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 27-31, 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 30, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 30, 2015:

Dr. Rai will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Rai's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.