Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Raijman Langsam, Isaac (CPSO#: 65673)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2000