Railton, Karl Thomas (CPSO#: 66575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6783
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.T. Railton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Railton ( CPSO# 66575 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARL THOMAS RAILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAILTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1996