Raiman, Julian Andrew Jonathon (CPSO#: 78155)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 26 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2015