Raizman, Alla (CPSO#: 97157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Tashkent State Medical Institute, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: 905-378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System
St Catharines General Site
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alla Raizman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raizman ( CPSO# 97157 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jan 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Alla Raizman may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.