Rajab, Ohoud Ramzi M (CPSO#: 91738)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011