Rajagopal, Sudhashree (CPSO#: 58034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L3M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Ext. 5135
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Rajagopal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rajagopal ( CPSO# 58034 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUDHASHREE RAJAGOPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAGOPAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1988