Rajagopaul, Kreasan (CPSO#: 80118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Falls Medical Centre
Suite 302
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone: (905) 357-4800
Fax: (905) 357-9800
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Rajagopaul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rajagopaul ( CPSO# 80118 )

Business Address:
Niagara Falls Medical Centre
Suite 302
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 357-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KREASAN RAJAGOPAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAGOPAUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 22 Aug 2003 to 21 Feb 2004
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2008