Rajah, Rashid (CPSO#: 60205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rashid Rajah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rajah ( CPSO# 60205 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212


Corporation Name: R. Rajah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RASHID RAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992