Rajakumar, Alphonsus Ruban Joe (CPSO#: 63611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saskatchewan Heart Centre
Spadina Medical clinic,
2-806 Spadina Crescent E
Saskatoon SK  S7K 3H4
Phone: (306) 956-2500
Fax: (306) 956-2501
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Heart Center
Markington Square
3227 Eglinton Ave E, Unit 143-144
Toronto M1J 3M5
Toronto ON  M1V 2J7
Canada
Phone: (416) 261 4446
Fax: (905) 474-3331
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Med-Scan Nuclear Medicine and
Cardiology.
22-2810 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 3L2
Canada
Phone: 905 832 8984
Fax: 905 832 0645
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan
Sri Lanka

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALPHONSUS RUBAN JOE RAJAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1999