Rajan, Aziza Aminmohamed (CPSO#: 57515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
712 Davis Drive
Suite 306
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905) 836-6721
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aziza A. Rajan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rajan ( CPSO# 57515 )

Business Address:
306 - 712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone Number: (905) 836-6721

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZIZA AMINMOHAMED RAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1988